MD SB599 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing specified provisions of law establishing an Expedited Partner Therapy Pilot Program in the Baltimore city Health Department; providing for the purpose of expedited partner therapy; authorizing licensed physicians, advanced practice registered nurses, and physician assistants who diagnose chlamydia or gonorrhea in an individual patient to prescribe, dispense, or otherwise provide prescription antibiotic drugs to that patient's sexual partners without examination of that patient's partners; etc.
Title
Public Health - Expedited Partner Therapy for Chlamydia and Gonorrhea
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-4) (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2015-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-4) |
2015-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {156686/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-24 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {284832/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Pugh) Adopted |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Diseases
Drugs
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Nurses
Patients
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Public Health
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Diseases
Drugs
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Nurses
Patients
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Public Health
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset