MD SB595 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring specified public charter schools to take specified steps to maintain a specified ratio as part of the initial cohort of students in a grade; authorizing specified public charter schools to give specified students a greater weight to the student's lottery status as part of the public charter school's admissions lottery; authorizing a county board to consider specified issues relating to school site and school building utilization when authorizing specified public charter schools to occupy specified sites or buildings; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Charter School Improvement Act of 2015

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-7) (Y: 131 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-1) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-12SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 311
2015-04-13SenatePassed Enrolled
2015-04-13SenateThird Reading Passed (44-1)
2015-04-13SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2015-04-13HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (131-7)
2015-04-11HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2015-04-10HouseSpecial Order until 4/11 (Delegate Hixson) Adopted
2015-04-10HouseFavorable with Amendments {535864/1 Report Adopted
2015-04-10HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2015-04-09HouseHearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-04-08HouseRereferred to Ways and Means
2015-04-07HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2015-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (46-1)
2015-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2015-04-03SenateFavorable with Amendments {794139/1 Report Adopted
2015-04-02SenateLaid Over (Senator Kelley) Adopted
2015-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments {794139/1
2015-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2015-03-04SenateHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
2015-02-09SenateMotion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
2015-02-06SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0595?ys=2015rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/sb/sb0595f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/sb/sb0595t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/sb/sb0595e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/Chapters_noln/CH_311_sb0595e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0595_79413901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0595_53586401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/fnotes/bil_0005/sb0595.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/sb0595_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/sb0595_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0595,s-0747&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0595,s-1155&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0595,h-1206&stab=02&ys=2015RS

Bill Comments

feedback