MD SB592 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 672
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 672
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that, in an action of summary ejectment for failure to pay rent where a landlord or park owner is awarded a judgment giving restitution of the leased premises, a tenant or resident who has the right to redemption of the leased premises by tendering all past due amounts plus court awarded costs and fees may tender those amounts, costs, and fees in an electronic or written check issued by a political subdivision or on behalf of a governmental entity.
Title
Landlord and Tenant – Right to Redemption of Leased Premises – Form of Payment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 117 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 672 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (117-7) |
2022-04-01 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {583224/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB932 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 671
Subjects
Checks
Debt Collection
Electronic Government
Emergency Bills
Eviction
Judgments
Jurisdiction
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Real Property
Residential Property
Debt Collection
Electronic Government
Emergency Bills
Eviction
Judgments
Jurisdiction
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Real Property
Residential Property
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 8 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8A | 1701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Baltimore City | 9 | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |