MD SB587 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-01 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that a certain payroll deduction occur within a certain period of time; requiring that certain payroll deductions for certain employees resume under certain circumstances; specifying that a certain exclusive representative represent certain employees for the purposes of negotiating and enforcing a certain memorandum of understanding; providing that a certain exclusive representative is not required to represent certain employees in certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Personnel - Employee Organizations and Exclusive Representatives - Dues and Representation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-01SenateUnfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
2019-02-21SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-11SenateHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback