MD SB586 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 521
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 521
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to notify the Baltimore Police Department, within 24 hours of a release, if a defendant is released prior to trial; establishing the Jobs Court Pilot Program in the District Court sitting in Baltimore City to reduce recidivism by offering defendants an opportunity to take part in full-time job training and job placement programs as a condition of probation; requiring the Administrative Office of the Courts to develop a plan to implement and monitor the pilot program; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure and Public Safety - Courts and Criminal Justice in Baltimore City
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 521 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (101-35) |
2022-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {553021/1 Adopted |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2022-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-16 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {543026/1 Adopted |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {543026/1 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB441 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 520
Subjects
Administrative Office of the Courts
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Budgets
Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Criminal Law - Procedures
defendants
Guns
Hijacking
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Murder
Notices
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Pretrial Detention or Release
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Robbery
State's Attorneys
Sunset
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Budgets
Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Criminal Law - Procedures
defendants
Guns
Hijacking
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Murder
Notices
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Pretrial Detention or Release
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Robbery
State's Attorneys
Sunset
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 5 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 6 | 236 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 3 | 501.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |