MD SB581 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB387
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 507
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 507
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a court to waive a certain publication requirement in an action for change of name under the Maryland Rules on motion by an individual who has filed the action.
Title
Action for Change of Name - Waiver of Publication Requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 507 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-10) |
2021-04-05 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (34-13) |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 10:00 a.m. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB39 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 506
SB387 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
SB387 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 2201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |