MD HB39 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 506
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 506
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a court to waive a certain publication requirement in an action for change of name under the Maryland Rules on motion by an individual who has filed the action.
Title
Action for Change of Name - Waiver of Publication Requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 506 |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (35-12) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-4) |
2021-02-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-04 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2020-12-23 | House | Hearing 1/15 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2020-09-23 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB581 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 507
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 2201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |