MD SB387 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Administrator of a certain abandoned property fund to distribute $5,000,000 to the Community Development Program Fund; altering the contents of the Community Development Program Fund to include any money distributed from a certain abandoned property fund; and repealing certain provisions providing for the construction of certain Acts of the General Assembly concerning the Community Development Program Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing - Community Development Program Act - Funding

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10SenateHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-10SenateHearing canceled
2020-01-29SenateHearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-01-27SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Same As/Similar To

HB472 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Chapter of the Acts2018(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law17317(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development6606(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback