MD HB472 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Administrator of a certain abandoned property fund to distribute $5,000,000 to the Community Development Program Fund; altering the contents of the Community Development Program Fund to include any money distributed from a certain abandoned property fund; and repealing certain provisions providing for the construction of certain Acts of the General Assembly concerning the Community Development Program Act.
Title
Housing - Community Development Program Act - Funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2020-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-24 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB387 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Abandoned Property
Appropriations
Budgets
Community Development
Economic and Community Development
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Revenue and Taxes
Appropriations
Budgets
Community Development
Economic and Community Development
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Revenue and Taxes
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2018 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Commercial Law | 17 | 317 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 6 | 606 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |