MD SB575 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Department of Education to establish a certain stakeholder advisory group to develop a certain reading and dyslexia handbook; requiring the Department and the advisory stakeholder group to make a completed handbook available to the public by June 1, 2021, and to develop a list of recommended programs and materials that address certain needs; requiring the Department to update the handbook every 3 years; requiring the handbook and updates to be published and disseminated in a certain manner; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-05SenateHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-31SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB718 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-04 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education1101(n/a)See Bill Text
Education8420(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback