MD SB126 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB575

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-06 - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Department of Education to establish, by October 1, 2021, a stakeholder advisory group to develop a reading and dyslexia handbook to guide local school systems in the implementation of best practices for early literacy and dyslexia; requiring a completed handbook be made available to the public by June 1, 2022; requiring the development of tools and materials to address the needs of at-risk and struggling students with dyslexia; requiring the Department to update the handbook every 3 years; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-06SenateHearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-10-28SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB237 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB575 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education1101(n/a)See Bill Text
Education4136(n/a)See Bill Text
Education8420(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback