MD SB572 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing employees on a public work contract to sue to recover the difference between certain prevailing wage rates and the amounts received by the employees; providing that a certain determination by the Commissioner of Labor and Industry does not preclude certain employees from filing a certain action; and providing for the liability of certain contractors and subcontractors under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (88-49) (Y: 89 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-13) (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25SenateVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2018-03-20SenateReturned Passed
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (88-49)
2018-03-19HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-19HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-19HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2018-03-12HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2018-03-09SenateThird Reading Passed (32-13)
2018-03-07SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-07SenateFloor Amendment {293126/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected
2018-03-07SenateFavorable with Amendments {597371/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-06SenateSpecial Order until 3/7 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2018-03-06SenateCommittee Amendment {597371/1
2018-03-02SenateSpecial Order until 3/6 (Senator Astle) Adopted
2018-03-02SenateFavorable with Amendments {597371/1
2018-03-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-02-20SenateHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-31SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0572&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0572f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0572t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0572_59737101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0572_29312601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0002/sb0572.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0572_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0473.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0572_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0775.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/veto_letters/sb0572.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback