MD SB566 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Referred Environment and Transportation
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Referred Environment and Transportation
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County to increase the rate of the transfer tax imposed on certain written instruments conveying title to property or a leasehold interest in real property; requiring any revenue derived from a higher transfer tax rate to be distributed to a certain special fund; establishing a Housing Trust Special Revenue Fund and requiring that certain revenue attributable to certain transfer and recordation tax rates be paid into the fund; etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County – Transfer Tax – Housing Trust Special Revenue Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-15) |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Favorable |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/12 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB933 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Housing
Local Government Mandates
Recordation
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Transfer Tax
Housing
Local Government Mandates
Recordation
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Transfer Tax
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Arundel County | 4 | 11-111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Anne Arundel County | 4 | 11-122 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Anne Arundel County | 4 | 3A-102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |