MD SB563 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Hearing: Mar 27 @ 1:00 pm House Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a local governing body, on application by a property owner for a certain special exception to construct or operate a landfill, to require the preparation of an environmental justice analysis at the expense of the property owner; requiring an environmental justice analysis prepared under the Act to include certain descriptions and assessments; and providing for the application of the Act to charter counties and Baltimore City.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Zoning - Special Exceptions - Construction or Operation of Landfills

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-11) (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (36-11)
2019-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-12SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-11SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback