MD SB563 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that specified dependents who are determined eligible to receive services from the Developmental Disabilities Administration shall retain eligibility for the services under specified circumstances; requiring the Administration to allow specified dependents to remain on a specified waiting list under specified circumstances; requiring the Administration to reinstate specified services for specified dependents under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration and Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Services - Military Families
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-04-11 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-11 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-11 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-18 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {857077/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Armed Forces
Community Facilities and Services
Developmental Disabilities
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Home Care Services
Medical Assistance
Public Health
Armed Forces
Community Facilities and Services
Developmental Disabilities
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Home Care Services
Medical Assistance
Public Health