MD SB562 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the amount of a credit against specified State taxes for wages and child care or transportation expenses related to qualified employees with disabilities; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2014.
Title
Tax Credits - Employment of Individuals With Disabilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2015-04-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-13 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2015-04-13 | House | Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-04-11 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2015-04-11 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Child Care
Corporations
Disabilities
Disabled
Franchise Tax
Income Tax
Revenue and Taxes
Tax Credits
Transportation
Work, Labor and Employment
Corporations
Disabilities
Disabled
Franchise Tax
Income Tax
Revenue and Taxes
Tax Credits
Transportation
Work, Labor and Employment