MD SB547 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 554
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 554
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City to issue a Class B-D-7 license in the 4800 block of Harford Road in the 45th alcoholic beverages district if the applicant meets certain requirements.
Title
Baltimore City - 45th District - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 License
Sponsors
Sen. Cory McCray [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 554 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-1) |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB868 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 553
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Food
License Commissioners, Boards of
Revenue and Taxes
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Food
License Commissioners, Boards of
Revenue and Taxes
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 1603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |