MD SB544 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-06 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-06 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a person engaged in the business of selling ammunition to keep specified records of ammunition sales; requiring a person engaged in the business of selling ammunition to verify specified information; requiring the Secretary of State Police to adopt specified regulations; authorizing the Secretary or the Secretary's designee to inspect specified records under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Ammunition - Sales Records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Dealers
Disclosure
Guns
Identification
Inspections
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Records
Rules and Regulations
State Police, Department of
Weapons
Disclosure
Guns
Identification
Inspections
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Records
Rules and Regulations
State Police, Department of
Weapons