MD SB543 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying the State minimum wage rate that is in effect for certain time periods; increasing, except under certain circumstances, the State minimum wage rate based on the annual growth in the Consumer Price Index for All Urban Consumers for the Washington-Baltimore metropolitan area; specifying the tip credit amount that is in effect for certain time periods; prohibiting an employer, beginning July 1, 2026, from including the tip credit amount as part of the wage of certain employees; etc.
Title
Labor and Employment - Payment of the Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Overridden (32-15) (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Price Index
Credit
Data
District of Columbia
Electronic Communication
Governor
Labor and Industry, Division of
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Records
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Personnel
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Price Index
Credit
Data
District of Columbia
Electronic Communication
Governor
Labor and Industry, Division of
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Records
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Personnel
Time
Work, Labor and Employment