MD SB538 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB799
Note: Carry Foward to future SB795
Note: Carry Foward to future SB795
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain funding be provided to certain institutions of higher education in certain fiscal years.
Title
Community Colleges and Private Nonprofit Institutions of Higher Education - Funding
Sponsors
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-20 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {439139/1 Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
SB538 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
SB538 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
HB1067 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-21 - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
SB538 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
HB1067 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-21 - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Appropriations
Armed Forces
Budgets
Community Colleges
Disabilities
Elderly Persons
Foster Care
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Nurses
Residency
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Students
Teachers
Tuition
Veterans
Armed Forces
Budgets
Community Colleges
Disabilities
Elderly Persons
Foster Care
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Nurses
Residency
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Students
Teachers
Tuition
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 16 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 16 | 512 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 17 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |