MD SB535 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that any student financial aid, other than a student loan, received by a specified disabled student must be applied first to pay the student's tuition prior to receiving an exemption from the payment of tuition at community colleges; etc.
Title
Community Colleges - Tuition Waiver for Disabled Individuals - Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-24 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Community Colleges
Disabilities
Higher Education
Local Government Mandates
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Tuition
Disabilities
Higher Education
Local Government Mandates
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Tuition