MD SB531 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the time period after which a person may not seek damages incurred as a result of an error in a land survey; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Title
Civil Actions - Limitation of Actions - Land Surveyors
Sponsors
Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] | Sen. Larry Haines [R] | Sen. Nancy Jacobs [R] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] |
Sen. Anthony Muse [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (138-2) | |
2010-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2010-03-26 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-23 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2010-04-05 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | |
2010-03-25 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-25 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-04 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |