MD SB53 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB136

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-10 - Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Hearing: Jan 27 @ 2:00 pm Senate Judicial Proceedings Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a law enforcement officer who takes a child into custody, interrogates or charges a child with a criminal violation to provide reasonable notice to the child's parents, guardian, or custodian; requiring the notice to include the child's location, the reason for the custody action, and instructions on how to make in-person contact; prohibiting the interrogation of a child by a law enforcement officer until the child has consulted with a certain attorney and a notice has been provided to the child's parents, guardian or custodian; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Law - Juvenile Interrogation Protection Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-10SenateHearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
2022-01-12SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2021-10-06SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB136 (Carry Over) 2020-12-28 - Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
HB269 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-14 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Courts and Judicial Proceedings38A-14(n/a)See Bill Text
Courts and Judicial Proceedings38A-14.2(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Procedure2108(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Procedure2405(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback