MD HB269 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB315
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a law enforcement officer who takes a child into custody, interrogates a child, or charges a child with a criminal violation to provide reasonable notice to the child's parents, guardian, or custodian; requiring the notice to include the child's location, the reason for the custody action, and instructions on how to make in-person contact; prohibiting the interrogation of a child by a law enforcement officer until the child has consulted with a certain attorney and notice has been provided to certain individuals; etc.
Title
Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 91 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Floor Amendment 723020/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (Y: 44 N: 90 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-30 - House - Floor Amendment 913328/1 (Delegate Griffith) Rejected (Y: 44 N: 90 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-30 - House - Floor Amendment 723020/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (Y: 44 N: 90 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-30 - House - Floor Amendment 913328/1 (Delegate Griffith) Rejected (Y: 44 N: 90 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (91-41) |
2022-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-30 | House | Floor Amendment {723020/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (44-90) |
2022-03-30 | House | Floor Amendment {913328/1 (Delegate Griffith) Rejected (44-90) |
2022-03-29 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Griffith) Adopted |
2022-03-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments {193124/1 Adopted |
2022-03-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2022-03-28 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-14 | House | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB53 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-09 - Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 50
HB315 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
HB315 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Arrests
Attorneys
Court of Appeals
Crimes and Punishments
Electronic Government
Investigations and Inquiries
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Law Enforcement
Legal Aid
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Privacy
Recordings
Records
Rules and Regulations
Attorneys
Court of Appeals
Crimes and Punishments
Electronic Government
Investigations and Inquiries
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Law Enforcement
Legal Aid
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Privacy
Recordings
Records
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-14.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 2 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 2 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |