MD SB527 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the defined term "peer support counseling program" for peer services offered to fire, rescue, or emergency medical services members to be "peer support program"; and requiring peer support programs to be evidence-based.
Title
Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Entities - Peer Support Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2023-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2023-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-26 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-18 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Electronic Government
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Safety
Reports
Rescue Squads
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Safety
Reports
Rescue Squads
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 7 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |