MD SB519 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a prohibition in Frederick County against hunting or attempting to hunt nongame birds and mammals without first obtaining a hunting license.
Title
Frederick County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-5) (Y: 132 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-5) |
2017-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-03 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |