MD SB517 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain service providers to provide certain location information for certain electronic devices for up to 48 hours to a law enforcement agency or public safety answering point if the owner or user of the electronic device has been reported missing; prohibiting a person from being held civilly liable for making certain required disclosures; requiring the Department of State Police to collect and disseminate certain information under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Location Information (Kelsey Smith Act for Maryland)
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred Judiciary Economic Matters |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {763925/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB1053 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-11 - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedures
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Electronic Surveillance
Emergencies
Emergency Services
Law Enforcement
Liability
Mobile Devices
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Reports
State Police, Department of
Criminal Law - Procedures
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Electronic Surveillance
Emergencies
Emergency Services
Law Enforcement
Liability
Mobile Devices
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Reports
State Police, Department of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 1 | 203.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 1 | 203.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |