MD SB516 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing certain criteria for qualified offshore wind projects applied for on or after July 1, 2017, termed Round 2 offshore wind projects; altering and extending the minimum required percentage of energy that must be derived from Tier 1 renewable sources in the State's renewable energy portfolio standard in certain years; altering and extending the minimum required percentage of Tier 1 renewable energy that must be derived from solar energy in the State's renewable energy portfolio standard in certain years; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clean Energy Jobs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-13) (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {403723/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted (34-12) (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {413422/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (13-33) (Y: 14 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-20SenateThird Reading Passed (33-13)
2019-03-19SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-19SenateFloor Amendment {413422/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (13-33)
2019-03-19SenateFloor Amendment {343624/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2019-03-19SenateFloor Amendment {293723/1 (Senator Salling) Adopted
2019-03-19SenateFloor Amendment {403723/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted (34-12)
2019-03-19SenateFavorable with Amendments {147070/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateLaid Over (Senator Feldman) Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {147070/1
2019-03-15SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-11SenateHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0516&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0516f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0516t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0516_14707001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0516_29372301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0516_34362401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0516_40372301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0516_41342201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0006/sb0516.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0516_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0686.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0687.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0708.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback