MD SB51 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 143
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the identification and use of "target investment zones" by the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority for certain acquisition and development grants in certified heritage areas; repealing certain provisions under which the Authority may make acquisition or development grants under certain circumstances; and repealing the definition of "target investment zone".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Heritage Areas Authority – Acquisition or Development Grants – Repeal of Target Investment Zones

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 143
2019-04-05SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-05SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
2019-04-04HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-04HouseFavorable with Amendments {850818/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-21HouseHearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-18SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-15SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-01-09SenateHearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-11-01SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0051?ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0051f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0051t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0051e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_143_sb0051e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0051_85081801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0001/sb0051.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0051_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0661.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0051_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1342.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1218.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback