MD SB51 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that a driver of a vehicle, when overtaking a bicycle, an Electric Personal Assistive Mobility Device (EPAMD), or a motor scooter, pass safely at a distance of not less than 3 feet, with a specified exception; requiring a driver of a vehicle to yield the right-of-way to a person who is riding a bicycle, an EPAMD, or a motor scooter in a bike lane or shoulder under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bicycles, EPAMDs, and Motor Scooters - Rules of the Road
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (120-18) | |
2010-04-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-10 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-03-22 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-12 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2010-04-08 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (28-0) | |
2010-04-08 | Senate Concur - House Amendment | |
2010-02-11 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | |
2010-02-09 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-02-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-01-26 | Hearing 2/2 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-26 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-19 | Hearing 2/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2009-08-18 | Pre-filed |