MD SB508 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that a driver's license examination require an applicant to demonstrate the applicant's ability to take proper actions during a traffic stop; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to include content in the standardized driver education curriculum on the proper interaction between individuals and law enforcement officers during stops; requiring the Administration to develop the curriculum content in consultation with the Maryland Commission on Civil Rights and the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission; etc.
Title
Interaction With Law Enforcement Officers - Development and Implementation of Curriculum Content
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-07 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {674735/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Curriculum
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Safety
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Curriculum
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Safety
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration