MD SB493 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 740
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 740
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing to $4,000 the maximum amount of a State matching stipend awarded to certificated public school employees who teach in public schools that have comprehensive needs; requiring specified teachers in Anne Arundel County to receive a stipend to a maximum of $1,500 under specified circumstances; establishing the Teacher Induction, Retention, and Advancement Pilot Program; authorizing each county board of education to choose to participate in the Program; requiring a county board to select teachers to participate in the Program; etc.
Title
Teacher Induction, Retention, and Advancement Act of 2016
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] | Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] |
Sen. Thomas Middleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (35-11) (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (90-45) (Y: 90 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (90-45) (Y: 90 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-28 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 740 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (35-11) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2016-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (90-45) |
2016-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {545060/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-24 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-14) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {814736/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {814736/1 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Discipline
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Governor
Grants
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Licenses
Mentors
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Teachers
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Discipline
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Governor
Grants
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Licenses
Mentors
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Teachers