MD SB492 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - Referred Environment and Transportation
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - Referred Environment and Transportation
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing inspection and reporting requirements for certain permit holders; establishing administrative penalties for certain permit holders determined to be in significant noncompliance of certain State or federal water quality standards, effluent limitations, or other requirements; and requiring the Department of the Environment to clear a certain backlog of administratively continued permits on or before December 31, 2026.
Title
Environment - Discharge Permits - Inspections and Administrative Continuations
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] | Sen. Sarah Elfreth [D] | Sen. Clarence Lam [D] |
Sen. Obie Patterson [D] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] | Sen. Mary Washington [D] | Sen. Michael Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Floor Amendment {553928/1 (Senator Jackson) Adopted |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {173726/1 Adopted |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB649 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-09 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22
Subjects
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Federal Government
Health
Inspections
Penalties and Sentences
Public Buildings and Facilities
Reports
Safety
Sewage
Time
Water
Water Pollution
Weights and Measures
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Federal Government
Health
Inspections
Penalties and Sentences
Public Buildings and Facilities
Reports
Safety
Sewage
Time
Water
Water Pollution
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 328 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 328.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |