MD HB649 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing inspection and reporting requirements for certain permit holders; requiring the Department of the Environment maintain on its website a list of certain noncompliant permit holders and provide certain Senators and Delegates with a link to the list by monthly e-mail; establishing administrative penalties for certain permit holders determined to be in significant noncompliance of certain State or federal water quality standards, effluent limitations, or other requirements; etc.
Title
Environment - Discharge Permits - Inspections and Administrative Continuations
Sponsors
Del. Sara Love [D] | Del. Regina Boyce [D] | Del. Michele Guyton [D] | Del. Mary Lehman [D] |
Del. Sheila Ruth [D] | Del. Dana Stein [D] | Del. Vaughn Stewart [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 26 NV: 6 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 26 NV: 6 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-09 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22 |
2022-03-31 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-26) |
2022-03-31 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Readings Passed with Amendments (37-10) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Floor Amendment {483926/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {143828/1 Adopted |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-40) |
2022-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-19 | House | Floor Amendment {393927/1 (Delegate Grammer) Adopted |
2022-03-19 | House | Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Grammer) Adopted |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {373023/1 Adopted |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-04 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB492 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-18 - Referred Environment and Transportation
Subjects
Counties
Electronic Communication
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
General Assembly
Inspections
internet
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Time
Water Pollution
Weights and Measures
Electronic Communication
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
General Assembly
Inspections
internet
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Time
Water Pollution
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 328 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 328.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |