MD SB492 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB176
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for the first $5,000 of income earned by law enforcement officers to include a law enforcement officer who is a member of the Maryland Transportation Authority Police or any other State law enforcement unit and who resides in a political subdivision in which the crime rate exceeds the State's crime rate; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - State Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-28 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {609539/1 Adopted |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
SB492 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
HB843 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
HB843 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |