MD SB466 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-08 - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-08 - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the 9-1-1 Director's Council to work with a specified Board and specified organizations to identify, plan for, coordinate, and make recommendations regarding the call-taking and dispatch operations of public safety answering points in the State; requiring the Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems to work with the Maryland Association of Counties to secure specified staff and support; requiring the Council to report its recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly by December 1 each year; etc.
Title
Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - 9-1-1 Director's Council (Carl Henn's Law)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-08 | House | Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-04-08 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-27 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {267674/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Death
Disabilities
Disclosure
Diseases
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Fees
General Assembly
Governor
Health
Industry and Technology
Privacy
Public Information
Public Safety
Public Service Commission
Reports
Retirement Systems
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Utility Regulation
Workers' Compensation
Counties
Death
Disabilities
Disclosure
Diseases
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Fees
General Assembly
Governor
Health
Industry and Technology
Privacy
Public Information
Public Safety
Public Service Commission
Reports
Retirement Systems
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Utility Regulation
Workers' Compensation