MD SB451 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the County Council of Baltimore County, by ordinance, to impose development impact fees to finance the capital costs of additional or expanded public works, improvements, and facilities required to accommodate new construction or development; and requiring money collected through development impact fees used to finance the capital costs of additional or expanded public works, improvements, and facilities to be used in the surrounding community of the construction or development.
Title
Baltimore County – Development Impact Fees – Authorization and Use of Funds
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] | Sen. Delores Kelley [D] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Clarence Lam [D] |
Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (123-13) (Y: 123 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-13) |
2019-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-11 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {479130/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Baltimore County
Counties - Local Laws
County Councils
Development Fees and Taxes
Laws and Ordinances
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local
Counties - Local Laws
County Councils
Development Fees and Taxes
Laws and Ordinances
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local