MD SB448 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 497
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 497
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the calculation of certain funding for certain regional resource centers and each county public library system for certain fiscal years; and requiring, beginning January 1, 2024, each public library to offer at least one type of service alone or in partnership with units of government or nonprofit organizations.
Title
Education - Regional Resource Centers and Libraries - Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 497 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-2) |
2022-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {273229/1 Adopted |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {113724/1 Adopted |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB685 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 496
Subjects
Budgets
Counties
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Emergencies
Internet Access
Libraries
Mental and Behavioral Health
Residency
School Testing
Weights and Measures
Counties
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Emergencies
Internet Access
Libraries
Mental and Behavioral Health
Residency
School Testing
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 23 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 23 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 23 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 23 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |