MD HB685 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 496
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 496
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the calculation of certain funding for certain regional resource centers and each county public library system for certain fiscal years; and requiring, beginning January 1, 2024, each public library to offer at least one type of service alone or in partnership with units of government or nonprofit organizations.
Title
Education – Regional Resource Centers and Libraries – Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 496 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-2) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {973726/1 Adopted |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-2) |
2022-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {813523/1 Adopted |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB448 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 497
Subjects
Age
Budgets
Counties
COVID-19
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Emergencies
Health
Industry and Technology
internet
Internet Access
Libraries
Literacy
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nonprofit Organizations
pandemics
Partnerships
Residency
School Testing
Small Business
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Budgets
Counties
COVID-19
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Emergencies
Health
Industry and Technology
internet
Internet Access
Libraries
Literacy
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nonprofit Organizations
pandemics
Partnerships
Residency
School Testing
Small Business
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 23 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 23 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 23 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 23 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |