MD SB443 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the requirements for the subject matter of continuing education courses for licensees issued an initial license by the Real Estate Commission.
Title
Real Estate Brokers, Salespersons, and Associate Brokers - Continuing Education Courses - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB662 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313
Subjects
Advertising
Agents and Brokers
Business Occupations and Professions
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Disclosure
Escrow Accounts
Ethics
Financial Planners
Job Training
Landlords and Tenants
Licenses
Property Managers
Real Estate
Time
Agents and Brokers
Business Occupations and Professions
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Disclosure
Escrow Accounts
Ethics
Financial Planners
Job Training
Landlords and Tenants
Licenses
Property Managers
Real Estate
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Occupations and Professions | 17 | 315 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |