MD SB442 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim April 16 as National Healthcare Decisions Day.
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - National Healthcare Decisions Day
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Manno [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] |
Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (127-13) (Y: 127 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-4) (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-4) (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-13) |
2016-04-11 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-11 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-11 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-04-11 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2016-04-07 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-4) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Advance Medical Directives
Governor
Health
Holidays and Special Dates
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Governor
Health
Holidays and Special Dates
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials