MD SB436 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing that the owner of a rental vehicle may satisfy a certain insurance requirement by maintaining a certain security that is secondary to any other valid and collectible coverage under certain circumstances and subject to a certain exception; providing that security maintained by the owner of a rental vehicle or replacement vehicle is primary under certain circumstances; requiring the owner of a rental vehicle to provide a certain notice to the renter of the rental vehicle; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (106-24) (Y: 106 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 472
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (106-24)
2019-04-08HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-04-06HouseRereferred to Economic Matters
2019-04-06HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (45-1)
2019-04-04SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments {587777/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-08SenateHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-08SenateHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-01SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback