MD SB43 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-07 - Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-07 - Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund to accept premiums on an installment basis under specified circumstances; requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to ensure specified provisions of the Fund's installment payment plan; prohibiting the Fund from discriminating among insureds in a specified manner; prohibiting the Fund from paying a higher commission to specified producers; requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to study the enforcement of eligibility criteria for coverage in the Fund; etc.
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Acceptance of Premiums on Installment
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Colburn [R] | Sen. Lisa Gladden [D] | Sen. Verna Jones-Rodwell [D] | Sen. Nathaniel McFadden [D] |
Sen. Catherine Pugh [D] | Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] | Sen. James Robey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-07 | Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn | |
2011-01-19 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-01-18 | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-17 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Auditors and Audits
Disclosure
Discrimination
Electronic Government
Fees
Finance Companies
Hearings
Insurance Administration
Legislative Services, Department of
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Prices
Reports
Salaries
Auditors and Audits
Disclosure
Discrimination
Electronic Government
Fees
Finance Companies
Hearings
Insurance Administration
Legislative Services, Department of
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Prices
Reports
Salaries
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/SB0043.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/sb/sb0043f.pdf |