MD SB425 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Workgroup on Screening Related to Adverse Childhood Experiences; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to update, improve, and develop certain screening tools, submit certain screening tools to the Maryland Department of Health, study certain actions and best practices, develop a certain template, and make and develop certain recommendations; requiring the Workgroup to report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly by October 1, 2022; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workgroup on Screening Related to Adverse Childhood Experiences

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2021-01-24SenateHearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-20SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB783 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-04 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback