MD HB783 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Workgroup on Screening Related to Adverse Childhood Experiences; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to update, improve, and develop certain screening tools, submit certain screening tools to the Maryland Department of Health, study certain actions and best practices, develop a certain template, and make and develop certain recommendations; requiring the Workgroup to report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly by October 1, 2022; etc.
Title
Workgroup on Screening Related to Adverse Childhood Experiences
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB425 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-20 - Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Subjects
Age
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Counties
Data
Education, State Department of
Gender
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minorities
Minors
Physicians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Health
Public Information
Public Schools
Reports
Sexual Orientation
Students
Sunset
Time
Youth
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Counties
Data
Education, State Department of
Gender
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minorities
Minors
Physicians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Health
Public Information
Public Schools
Reports
Sexual Orientation
Students
Sunset
Time
Youth
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0783?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0783f.pdf |