MD SB424 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB199
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to include certain appropriations in the State budget from the Transportation Trust Fund to the Maryland Transit Administration for the operating and capital needs of the Administration in certain fiscal years; requiring that certain capital appropriations to the Administration be in addition to any funds appropriated for the capital planning, engineering, right-of-way acquisition, or construction of the Purple Line; etc.
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Funding (Transit Safety and Investment Act)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
SB424 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
HB368 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-15 - Referred Budget and Taxation
HB368 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-15 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Budgets
Capital Budgets
Construction
Engineers
Governor
Investments
Maps and Charts
Mass Transit
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Sunset
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Zoning and Planning
Appropriations
Budgets
Capital Budgets
Construction
Engineers
Governor
Investments
Maps and Charts
Mass Transit
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Sunset
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2018 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Transportation | 7 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 7 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0424?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0424f.pdf |