MD HB368 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to include certain appropriations in the State budget from the Transportation Trust Fund to the Maryland Transit Administration for certain operating and capital needs of the Administration in certain fiscal years; authorizing the reduction of certain appropriations under certain circumstances; requiring the Administration to submit a report each year on the planning and use of capital funds for certain capital projects in the prior fiscal year; declaring the intent of the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Funding (Transit Safety and Investment Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (95-36) |
2020-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {814060/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2020-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-22 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB424 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Budgets
Capital Budgets
Construction
Engineers
Governor
Investments
Maps and Charts
Mass Transit
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Sunset
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Zoning and Planning
Appropriations
Budgets
Capital Budgets
Construction
Engineers
Governor
Investments
Maps and Charts
Mass Transit
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Sunset
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2018 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Transportation | 7 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 7 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |