MD SB420 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB509
Note: Carry Over of previous SB704
Note: Carry Over of previous SB704
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the prohibition against a person using or possessing with intent to use drug paraphernalia to inject, ingest, inhale, or otherwise introduce into the human body a controlled dangerous substance; repealing the prohibition against a person delivering or selling, or manufacturing or possessing with intent to deliver or sell drug paraphernalia under certain circumstances; altering a list of certain items that indicate intent to use certain controlled paraphernalia for certain purposes; etc.
Title
Criminal Law – Drug Paraphernalia for Administration – Decriminalization
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Motion Limit Debate (Senator King) Adopted (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Floor Amendment 903928/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 19 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Motion Limit Debate (Senator King) Adopted (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Floor Amendment 903928/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 19 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (28-19) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Motion Limit Debate (Senator King) Adopted (32-14) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (95-38) |
2021-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {462512/1 Adopted |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2021-04-06 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2021-03-25 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (31-16) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Floor Amendment {903928/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (19-28) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {578176/1 Adopted |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {578176/1 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {578176/1 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
SB420 (Carry Over) 2021-05-26 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
HB372 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-22 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB704 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
HB372 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-22 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB704 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
Subjects
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Drugs
Equipment
Penalties and Sentences
Transfer of Goods
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Drugs
Equipment
Penalties and Sentences
Transfer of Goods
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 5 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 5 | 619 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 5 | 620 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |