MD HB372 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB720

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the prohibition against a person using or possessing with intent to use drug paraphernalia to inject, ingest, inhale, or otherwise introduce into the human body a controlled dangerous substance; repealing the prohibition against a person delivering or selling, or manufacturing or possessing with intent to deliver or sell drug paraphernalia under certain circumstances; altering a prohibition against a person possessing or distributing controlled paraphernalia under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia for Administration - Decriminalization

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 91 N: 39 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-22SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2021-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (91-39)
2021-03-19HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-03-19HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2020-12-23HouseHearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2020-06-16HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB720 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
SB420 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Passed Enrolled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Criminal Law5101(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Law5619(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Law5620(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback