MD SB414 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-27 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-27 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to prepare and have introduced into the General Assembly a bill, rather than a joint resolution, for the legislative redistricting plan for the General Assembly after each decennial census; authorizing any member of the General Assembly to introduce a bill presenting a legislative redistricting plan after each decennial census; requiring specified standing committees to hold hearings on the redistricting bills; etc.
Title
General Assembly - Legislative Redistricting - Plans to be Introduced as a Bill
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 11:00 a.m. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Boundaries
Constitutional Amendments
Elections
General Assembly
Governor
Hearings
Legislation
Reapportionment and Redistricting
Referendum
State Government - General Assembly
Constitutional Amendments
Elections
General Assembly
Governor
Hearings
Legislation
Reapportionment and Redistricting
Referendum
State Government - General Assembly